RI H5851 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals ยง 28-12-9 of the general laws which provides that the director of labor and training may approve of wages below the minimum wage for those persons whose earning capacity is impaired due to physical or mental disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Wages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Committee on Labor: Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-06-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2021)
2021-06-05SenateMeeting postponed (06/10/2021)
2021-06-04SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2021-05-07SenateReferred to Senate Labor
2021-05-06HouseHouse read and passed
2021-04-30HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/06/2021)
2021-04-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-04-23HouseScheduled for consideration (04/28/2021)
2021-03-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback