RI H5850 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the name of doctor of naturopathy to naturopathic doctor and permit them to administer IVs, perform phlebotomy, and consult, but not change, patient’s prescription medication.
Title
License Of Naturopathy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2021) |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/22/2021) |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5850.pdf |