RI H5847 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adds virtual currency to the existing electronic money transmission and sale of check licenses and adds additional regulatory provisions to simplify and clarify licensing related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed Activities--currency Transmissions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-27SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-14HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-04-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019)
2019-03-22HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/26/2019)
2019-03-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback