RI H5843 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the "meetings" requirements from ยง 34-36.1-3.08 be applicable to condominiums created before July 1, 1982 and permits remote participation in condominium meetings.
Title
Condominium Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2023) |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-04-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-04-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/05/2023) |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2023-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |