RI H5841 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Mandates bill of sale for transacted catalytic converter, changes requirement to three years for report, and would make a conviction of ยง 6-11.1-7 a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Regulatory Provisions -- Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-15SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2023-05-18HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2023-05-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/18/2023)
2023-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-05HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2023)
2023-03-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023)
2023-03-14HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback