RI H5839 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a charter school for students with dyslexia.
Title
The Rhode Island School For Dyslexia Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5839.pdf |