RI H5838 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes concurrent enrollment courses for students enrolled in accelerated world language courses thereby allowing the students to earn credits towards a degree at a state university while contemporaneously earning credits towards high school diploma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback