RI H5838 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that those persons taking part in the home and community care services to the elderly program (chapter 66.3 of title 42) would be eligible for lifeline telephone service.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5838.pdf |