RI H5836 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Amends the career and technical education program laws to provide the process by which students could access career and technical education programs outside of their home school district.
Title
Regional Vocational Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-06-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/19/2021) |
2021-05-14 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |