RI H5835 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/17/2021)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/17/2021)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Ri Office Of The Postsecondary Commissioner (riopc) To Develop A Post-graduate Certificate In Dyslexia Knowledge And Practice
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Ri Office Of The Postsecondary Commissioner (riopc) To Develop A Post-graduate Certificate In Dyslexia Knowledge And Practice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/17/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5835.pdf |