RI H5833 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Rhode Island ombudsperson for special education to ensure school districts meet the minimum standards required to comply with an individualized education program for students with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback