RI H5828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a system for the regulation and taxation for adult use and cultivation of marijuana.
Title
Adult Use Of Cannabis Pilot Program
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/26/2019) |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5828.pdf |