RI H5827 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires copies of auditor's documents relative to evaluation and opinion about fees to be filed with the Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation and be considered public records pursuant to chapter 2 of title 38, access to public records.
Title
Responsible Recycling, Reuse And Disposal Of Mattresses
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |