RI H5818 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 To The Rhode Island Office Of Housing And Community Development To Provide For The Housing Problem Solving Fund (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To The Office Of Housing And Community Development To Provide Funding For The Housing Problem Solving Fund.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 To The Rhode Island Office Of Housing And Community Development To Provide For The Housing Problem Solving Fund (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To The Office Of Housing And Community Development To Provide Funding For The Housing Problem Solving Fund.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023)
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback