RI H5816 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that in the town of Warwick, no separate class or zoning district be assigned or designated based solely upon a scenic view. No property in particular class/zoning district be assessed increased rate from other properties because of scenic view.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5816.pdf |