RI H5815 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurance contract to provide coverage for all FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5815.pdf |