RI H5800 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts up to a maximum of $250,000 of tangible personal property of businesses from taxation. Provides reimbursement to cities, towns, fire districts from state revenues, for the amount of lost taxes resulting from the exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Tangible Property Tax Exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-04-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023)
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback