RI H5796 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves Central Falls from reimbursing state for expenses related to fiscal stability act, expenses related to Central Falls school district bankruptcy proceeding, expenses of Moreau v Flanders, or expenses incurred after termination of receivership.
Title
Relating To Central Falls
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5796.pdf |