RI H5793 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides medical home care base rate adjustments and keeps high acuity or high medical necessity patients out of skilled nursing facilities and hospitals and remain safe at home with well trained and stable long-term care support.
Title
Medical Assistance--long-term Care Service And Finance Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5793.pdf |