RI H5790 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-29 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2023)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates public, high quality pre-kindergarten education programs which are available to all children ages three (3) and four (4) throughout Rhode Island to increase children’s school readiness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Pre-kindergarten Education Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-29HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (05/03/2023)
2023-04-28HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback