RI H5789 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/27/2023)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/27/2023)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of education and the DCYF to develop a procedure to ensure that the municipalities where group homes or other residential facilities are located are reimbursed for the educational expenses above the cost allocated.
Title
Residence Of Children For School Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/27/2023) |
2023-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5789.pdf |