RI H5776 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance - Voluntary Restructuring Of Solvent Insurers: would amend the Voluntary Restructuring of Solvent Insurers to lower the application fee and provide for reimbursement to the state of cost incurred in solvent runoffs.
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance - Voluntary Restructuring Of Solvent Insurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-23 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-21 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-21 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-25 | Referred to Senate Corporations | |
2011-05-24 | House read and passed | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-12 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5776.pdf |