RI H5773 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the council on elementary and secondary education to ratify any collective bargaining agreement entered into on behalf of the Providence public school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Paul W. Crowley Rhode Island Student Investment Initiative

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2023-06-14HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-13SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-08SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-05-30HouseHouse read and passed
2023-05-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2023)
2023-05-11HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-05HouseScheduled for consideration (05/11/2023)
2023-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023)
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback