RI H5766 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds post-traumatic stress disorder to the definition of "debilitating medical condition" for purposes of qualifying for medical marijuana provided that patient is 18 years of age or older.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |