RI H5763 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds campus police officers to the group of public safety officials eligible to collect salary, wages, benefits during periods of whole/partial incapacitation incurred while on-duty or while providing emergency assistance within the state while off-duty.
Title
Relief Of Injured And Deceased Firefighters And Police Officers
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5763.pdf |