RI H5756 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new post election audit procedure to verify the accuracy of mail ballot envelopes user's signature prior to the certification of the elections results.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5756.pdf |