RI H5754 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real, tangible and personal property of Wood River Health Services, Inc., a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, with locations in Westerly and Hopkinton, Rhode Island.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Tina Spears [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5754.pdf |