RI H5741 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public building/place of public accommodation to have single-user toilet facility for use by any gender eff. 1/1/22/ new construction/ renovations over 50% value of state/municipal buildings provide for single-user toilet eff. 1/1/22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Building Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2021-06-30HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-29SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-06-26SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021)
2021-06-14SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-06-11SenateScheduled for consideration (06/14/2021)
2021-05-20SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2021-05-18HouseHouse read and passed
2021-05-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/18/2021)
2021-05-03HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for consideration (05/03/2021)
2021-03-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback