RI H5740 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes conditions, policies and procedures for the restrictive housing of inmates at correctional facilities in Rhode Island with the least restrictive conditions possible.
Title
Restrictive Housing At Correctional Facilities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5740.pdf |