RI H5735 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the judicial nominating commission to consider a nominee's unique background and overall competence in all areas of practice of laws rather than emphasizing trial and courtroom experience in selecting nominees for the judiciary.
Title
Judicial Selection
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5735.pdf |