RI H5733 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows jurors to donate their juror fees to the state. Any such donation would be deposited into a restricted receipt account in the general fund and shall be allocated to the Rhode Island Veterans Home Community Living Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure Generally--fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01HouseSigned by Governor
2021-06-29HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-29SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021)
2021-06-24SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-22SenateScheduled for consideration (06/24/2021)
2021-06-11SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2021-06-10HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-06-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/10/2021)
2021-06-02HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-05-28HouseProposed Substitute
2021-05-28HouseScheduled for consideration (06/02/2021)
2021-03-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback