RI H5730 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-09 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Rhode Island Public Transit Authority (RIPTA) to conduct a study on the feasibility of installing as many benches and canopies above said benches as possible in front of RIPTA bus stops with its report due on March 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Public Transit Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09SenateReferred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
2023-05-09HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-05-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/09/2023)
2023-05-02HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-04-28HouseScheduled for consideration (05/02/2023)
2023-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023)
2023-02-21HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback