RI H5726 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution - Provisions Of State Constitution Declared To Be Presumptively Judicially Enforceable By Parties Allegedly Aggrieved By Violations Thereof (proposes To The Voters Of The State A Constitutional Amendment That The Provisions Of The State Constitution Are Presumptively Judicially Enforceable By Parties Allegedly Aggrieved By Violations Thereof.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution - Provisions Of State Constitution Declared To Be Presumptively Judicially Enforceable By Parties Allegedly Aggrieved By Violations Thereof (proposes To The Voters Of The State A Constitutional Amendment That The Provisions Of The State Constitution Are Presumptively Judicially Enforceable By Parties Allegedly Aggrieved By Violations Thereof.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023)
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback