RI H5724 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local law enforcement to share information with local school departments for the purposes of notifying parents of students whose bus stop is within 1000 feet of the residence of level 3 sex offender.
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-30 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |