RI H5719 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no party would be deemed jointly liable in tort for an injury to person or property unless it is determined that such person is at least fifty-one percent (51%) liable in tort for the injury.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5719.pdf |