RI H5714 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the Rite Track Program to provide health care coverage to children up to age nineteen (19) funded by federal funds, if available, or if not available, by state funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care For Children And Pregnant Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2021)
2021-05-10HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (05/13/2021)
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2021-02-28HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback