RI H5714 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Licensing Of Massage Therapy Establishments (would Make Changes To The Process Of Licensing Of Massage Therapist Establishments.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Licensing Of Massage Therapy Establishments (would Make Changes To The Process Of Licensing Of Massage Therapist Establishments.)
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |