RI H5713 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/14/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/14/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense (would Raise The Amount Of Life Insurance For Which The State Will Reimburse A Rhode Island National Guard Member From Four Hundred Thousand Dollars To Five Hundred Thousand Dollars)
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense (would Raise The Amount Of Life Insurance For Which The State Will Reimburse A Rhode Island National Guard Member From Four Hundred Thousand Dollars To Five Hundred Thousand Dollars)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/14/2013) |
2013-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5713.pdf |