RI H5713 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To North Cumberland Fire District
Title
An Act Relating To North Cumberland Fire District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | |
2011-06-01 | House read and passed | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5713.pdf |