RI H5711 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes magistrates to preside over additional matters that are heard before the family court.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-06 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |