RI H5709 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires minimum insurance coverage for a minimum of ninety (90) days of residential or inpatient services for mental health and/or substance use disorders. Effective 4/1/21 or date of passage.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5709.pdf |