RI H5709 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-05 - House voted to recommit to House Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-05 - House voted to recommit to House Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Honor And Remembrance Flag
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Honor And Remembrance Flag
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | House voted to recommit to House Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee transferred to House Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2013-05-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2013) |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5709.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5709A.pdf |