RI H5703 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an education savings account program to assist and support the parents, guardians and caretakers of students with the materials, tutors, technology and other educational support for learning at-home or at any other remote-learning site.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5703.pdf |