RI H5700 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines an obstruction to a public right-of-way to include signage that deters the public from using a public right-of-way and subjects such violation to a fine not to exceed five hundred dollars ($500).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trespass And Vandalism

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023)
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback