RI H5698 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Requires all public schools to send out written invitations to all parents, guardians or caretakers of students inviting those parents, guardians or caretakers to an orientation at the school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Committees And Superintendents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-07HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-07-01SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-06-21SenateScheduled for consideration (06/23/2021)
2021-06-09SenateCommittee heard
2021-06-04SenateScheduled for hearing (06/09/2021)
2021-06-04SenateReferred to Senate Education
2021-06-01HouseHouse read and passed
2021-05-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/01/2021)
2021-05-25HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-05-21HouseScheduled for consideration (05/25/2021)
2021-03-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback