RI H5697 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mandates that the clerk of the district court automatically also seal individual counts of criminal complaints upon dismissal pursuant to rule 48(a) of the rules of criminal procedure for district court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identification And Apprehension Of Criminals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023)
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback