RI H5686 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Weapons (would Provide For The Destruction Of The Application Records For The Purchase Of A Rifle Or Shotgun, If An Applicant Is Disqualified Under The Applicable Provisions Of The General Laws)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Weapons (would Provide For The Destruction Of The Application Records For The Purchase Of A Rifle Or Shotgun, If An Applicant Is Disqualified Under The Applicable Provisions Of The General Laws)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5686.pdf |