RI H5678 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits nonregulated power producers from automatically renewing a contract. Mandates that the nonregulated power producer provide methods for the customer to cancel service and provide the customer with notice of the contract expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-27HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-25HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-03-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback