RI H5677 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that dental services and treatment rendered to patients in Rhode Island would be reimbursed by standards governed by the general laws of Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Accessibility And Quality Assurance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2023)
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback