RI H5676 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the owner of motor vehicles, which is between ten (10) and twenty (20) years old and cannot locate a title certificate obtain a registration certificate with the name of the current registered owner(s).
Title
Missing Titles For Older Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/12/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5676.pdf |